Accounts and annual returns REDDISH VALE SCHOOL TECHNOLOGY COLLEGE SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1067452
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2011 23 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 23 November 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2010 29 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 29 September 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2009 30 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 30 November 2009 On Time