Financial history THE BARNOLDSWICK OLD AGE PENSIONERS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1068302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £4.86k £2.50k £13.60k £25.28k £40.73k
Total expenditure £4.19k £10.80k £9.00k £32.68k £23.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £9.00k £14.97k £8.50k