Financial history THE GOGMAGOGS

Charity number: 1067401
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2010
Total gross income £57.47k £43.84k £9.66k £5.84k £500
Total expenditure £56.39k £49.73k £9.00k £8.15k £688
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A