Accounts and annual returns THE RAY ENDFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1070047
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 03 March 2008 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 23 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 27 April 2006 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 27 April 2006 86 days late