Financial history THE AGE CONCERN DAWLEY DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1078547
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011
Total gross income £2.96k £3.15k £4.42k £3.82k £3.90k
Total expenditure £3.11k £3.23k £3.43k £3.70k £3.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A