Accounts and annual returns THE WYE VALLEY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1067150
Charity reporting is overdue by 1796 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 701 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 701 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1066 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1066 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1431 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1431 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1796 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1796 days