Accounts and annual returns THE SQUIRRELS CANTERBURY

Charity Number: 1066815
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2018 26 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 26 November 2018 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2017 29 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 November 2017 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2016 30 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 November 2016 On Time