Financial history GOSFORTH CENTRAL MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1067955
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £15.11k £11.78k £9.04k £416 £3.05k
Total expenditure £14.90k £10.09k £7.63k £7.76k £11.62k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A