Accounts and annual returns BOVERIDGE HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity Number: 1067783
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 04 July 2013 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 04 July 2013 4 days late
Annual return 31 August 2011 21 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 21 May 2012 On Time