Financial history THE YOM TOV ASSISTANCE FUND

Charity Number: 1067741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £125.01k £161.24k £155.11k £154.17k £171.37k
Total expenditure £148.16k £138.60k £130.78k £144.04k £171.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A