Accounts and annual returns AFRICAN CARIBBEAN COMMUNITY ACTION NETWORK

Charity Number: 1068546
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 03 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 12 November 2008 286 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 04 May 2007 93 days late