Accounts and annual returns THE CREEDY HOUSE CARE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1075286
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 18 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 18 May 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 23 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 23 September 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 19 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 19 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 25 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 25 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 25 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required