Accounts and annual returns KINGSNORTH RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1069858
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 November 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 December 2019 On Time