Financial history POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1067914
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £34.37k £21.50k £14.73k £7.86k £8.45k
Total expenditure £35.95k £28.17k £15.02k £7.80k £4.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A