Financial history LOUGHTON MIDDLE SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1067878
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £52.31k £112.99k £72.99k £69.27k £87.02k
Total expenditure £51.87k £109.17k £61.87k £76.75k £72.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0