Financial history SCHOOLS WORK IN PENDLE TRUST

Charity number: 1068237
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £12.13k £11.33k £8.92k £8.92k £4.47k
Total expenditure £12.00k £12.00k £9.00k £9.00k £4.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A