Financial history NORTHAMPTON, PUNJABI CONGREGATIONAL JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1068140
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £2.35k £2.83k £4.26k £2.95k £3.53k
Total expenditure £3.43k £2.60k £3.97k £2.40k £3.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A