Trustees THE ASSOCIATION OF THE EGYPTIAN NUBIAN COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM LTD
Charity number: 1079689

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samir Hussein | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Fares | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hassan Awwad | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samer Hassan | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Hamdin | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ramy Elsayed | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdalla Gabralla | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eid Abdelhafiz Abdalla Soliman | Trustee | 26 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
HALIMA AWAD ABDEL RAHMAN | Trustee | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.