Trustees MONTSERRAT OVERSEAS PEOPLE'S PROGRESSIVE ALLIANCE
Charity Number: 1071564

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STANFORD FERGUS | Chair | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEIMA ALLEN | Trustee | 21 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Green | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd French | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARY FINDLOW | Trustee | 27 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE Josephine DALEY B.SC | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.