Financial history THE FRIENDS OF LYTHE C.E. SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1068719
Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £4.34k £7.10k £2.26k £968 £5.61k
Total expenditure £3.30k £6.59k £2.83k £1.57k £7.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A