Financial history IMPACT SCHOOLS TEAM TRUST

Charity number: 1068653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.27k £29.96k £29.96k £32.96k £34.75k
Total expenditure £40.42k £33.38k £33.38k £28.19k £44.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A