Accounts and annual returns REHAB (98) LIMITED

Charity Number: 1069960
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2013 22 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 04 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2012 27 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 01 March 2013 On Time