Financial history SV2 - SUPPORTING VICTIMS OF SEXUAL VIOLENCE LTD

Charity number: 1077863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £887.57k £1.03m £1.02m £1.28m £1.15m
Total expenditure £927.16k £991.90k £1.06m £1.19m £1.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £738.04k £439.34k
Income from government grants £165.26k £285.21k £442.40k £321.21k £372.14k
Income - Donations and legacies £7.85k £3.99k £1.85k £4.20k £6.53k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £74 £22 £14 £603 £3.39k
Income - Other £879.65k £1.03m £1.02m £1.28m £1.14m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £927.16k £991.90k £1.06m £737.77k £762.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £9.15k £9.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £449.04k £370.52k