Financial history GUILDFORD AND WAVERLEY CROSSROADS CARE

Charity number: 1069649
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £282.17k £354.45k £392.48k £341.73k £308.21k
Total expenditure £277.78k £336.83k £359.23k £369.65k £301.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A