Accounts and annual returns AWETU ALL WALES BLACK AND MINORITY ETHNIC MENTAL HEALTH GROUP LIMITED

Charity number: 1072162
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 16 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 11 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 26 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 26 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 04 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 14 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 03 March 2009 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 06 March 2009 34 days late