Accounts and annual returns BRETTON WOODS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1069105
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 14 March 2007 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 14 March 2007 42 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 24 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 24 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 27 April 2005 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 27 April 2005 86 days late