Financial history TEWKESBURY VOLUNTEER AND HELP CENTRE

Charity number: 1070727
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £75.03k £86.66k £87.23k £70.32k £16.16k
Total expenditure £65.06k £91.85k £81.68k £62.44k £50.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A