Financial history WHITEGROVE PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1069005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.31k £5.19k £20.36k £24.93k £23.50k
Total expenditure £19.60k £12.96k £9.64k £15.30k £23.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A