Accounts and annual returns SOUTH SOMERSET MUSLIM CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1070349
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 March 2025 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 March 2025 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 September 2024 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 September 2024 215 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 April 2022 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 April 2022 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window