Accounts and annual returns EAST END HEALTH

Charity number: 1076115
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 27 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 02 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 25 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 16 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 29 December 2008 On Time