Trustees SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF BRENT
Charity Number: 1069307

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Negar Hasankhani | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dominique Simara | Trustee | 13 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Winnie Lutchmaya | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alwyn O'Brien John Lutchmaya | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Venos Vokhshori | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saghar Forouhi | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joel Sterling Muschett | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Nassim Snaith | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIANA LEWIN | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.