Financial history COVENTRY HAVEN

Charity number: 1074897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.11m £1.47m £1.87m £1.76m £1.88m
Total expenditure £1.08m £1.26m £1.48m £1.70m £1.87m
Income from government contracts N/A £1.20m N/A £1.22m £1.25m
Income from government grants £707.32k £106.13k £144.35k £122.85k £242.96k
Income - Donations and legacies £64.24k £120.16k £60.60k £39.80k £49.23k
Income - Other trading activities £140 £7.67k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.05m £0 £1.46m £1.72m £1.53m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £140 £127 £0 £1.32k £7.40k
Income - Other £0 £0 £63 £2.28k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £1.26m £1.48m £1.61m £1.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £8.54k £101.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £87.50k £0