Accounts and annual returns SALISBURY AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity number: 1070397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 19 September 2024 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 19 September 2024 592 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 19 September 2024 592 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 June 2022 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 21 June 2022 136 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 May 2021 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required