Accounts and annual returns THETFORD AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1072430
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 02 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 29 February 2008 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required