Accounts and annual returns THE ANTHONY VEEDER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1070452
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2015 21 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 18 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2013 15 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2012 05 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required