Financial history FRIENDS OF COTEN END PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1071996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.08k £10.79k £13.58k £22.57k £17.06k
Total expenditure £26.03k £7.77k £8.97k £10.22k £19.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A