Financial history SOUTHDOWN OMNIBUS TRUST

Charity number: 1070513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.89k £2.18k £55.15k £374.41k £10.36k
Total expenditure £11.22k £3.51k £2.83k £83.58k £62.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A