Financial history THE BENNETT TRUST

Charity number: 1075847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £13.78k £17.76k £17.08k £16.49k £15.53k
Total expenditure £11.74k £6.57k £10.89k £18.22k £13.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A