Accounts and annual returns DESTINY CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1070364
Charity reporting is overdue by 1287 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 922 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 922 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1287 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1287 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required