Financial history BERERN ARTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1073186
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2009 31/01/2010 31/01/2011 31/01/2012 31/01/2013
Total gross income £25.74k £5.55k £176 £1.55k £200
Total expenditure £13.82k £15.31k £4.44k £1.24k £426
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A