Accounts and annual returns EQUALS (ENTITLEMENT AND QUALITY EDUCATION FOR PUPILS WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES)

Charity number: 1078849
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2008 21 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 21 August 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 05 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 30 July 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 04 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 04 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 31 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 31 August 2006 On Time