Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BRITISH SCHOOL- RIO DE JANEIRO

Charity number: 1071835
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 23 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 23 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 07 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 07 October 2005 On Time