Financial history THE EDWIN CHARLES ELLIS WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1070512
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2009 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013
Total gross income £9.53k £4.32k £1.97k £1.35k £443
Total expenditure £23.52k £80.06k £101.05k £10.22k £51.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A