Financial history FRIENDS OF ST. THOMAS MORE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (F.O.S.T.A.)

Charity number: 1074623
Removed charity

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0