Financial history DOVETAIL BIGGIN HILL

Charity number: 1073125
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2012 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £875 £0 £0 £0 £7.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0