Accounts and annual returns WORD OF SPIRIT AND LIFE (WOSAL) BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1075404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required