Financial history SUNNINGMEAD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1070269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £84.29k £56.39k £48.21k £49.74k £59.30k
Total expenditure £61.60k £54.64k £50.84k £61.60k £55.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £33.63k £36.94k £9.24k N/A N/A