Financial history PEREZ CHAPEL INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1113019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £67.04k £65.94k £64.92k £107.94k £128.93k
Total expenditure £58.52k £30.05k £41.41k £69.64k £68.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A