Accounts and annual returns THE FEAR FREE TRUST

Charity number: 1074542
Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 August 2024 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 March 2023 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 May 2022 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required