Accounts and annual returns THE UK PATTERN ARCHIVE

Charity Number: 1072855
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2008 01 October 2009 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not Required